Math - Entrance Exam (Fundamental)

Approved & Edited by ProProfs Editorial Team
The editorial team at ProProfs Quizzes consists of a select group of subject experts, trivia writers, and quiz masters who have authored over 10,000 quizzes taken by more than 100 million users. This team includes our in-house seasoned quiz moderators and subject matter experts. Our editorial experts, spread across the world, are rigorously trained using our comprehensive guidelines to ensure that you receive the highest quality quizzes.
Learn about Our Editorial Process
| By JETSPEED
J
JETSPEED
Community Contributor
Quizzes Created: 1 | Total Attempts: 2,552
Questions: 25 | Attempts: 2,670

SettingsSettingsSettings
Entrance Exam Quizzes & Trivia

Basic Operation Skill test. NO CALCULATOR IS ALLOWED!


Questions and Answers
  • 1. 

    42 + 36

    Explanation
    The correct answer is 78 because when you add 42 and 36 together, the sum is 78.

    Rate this question:

  • 2. 

    119 + 65

    Explanation
    The correct answer is 184 because when you add 119 and 65 together, the sum is 184.

    Rate this question:

  • 3. 

    4 x 14

    Explanation
    The given question is asking for the product of 4 and 14. When these two numbers are multiplied, the result is 56.

    Rate this question:

  • 4. 

    213 - 86

    Explanation
    The given question is asking for the difference between 213 and 86. By subtracting 86 from 213, we get the result of 127.

    Rate this question:

  • 5. 

    98/14

    Explanation
    The given expression is 98 divided by 14. When we divide 98 by 14, we get the quotient as 7. Therefore, the correct answer is 7.

    Rate this question:

  • 6. 

    2601/17

  • 7. 

    87 + 96 - 45

    Explanation
    The given expression 87 + 96 - 45 simplifies to 183 - 45, which equals 138.

    Rate this question:

  • 8. 

    84 x 32 / 12

    Explanation
    The given expression involves multiplication and division. To solve it, we first perform the multiplication: 84 multiplied by 32 equals 2688. Then, we divide the result by 12: 2688 divided by 12 equals 224. Therefore, the correct answer is 224.

    Rate this question:

  • 9. 

    2391 + 619 - 234

    Explanation
    The given expression involves addition and subtraction of numbers. When we add 2391 and 619, we get 3010. Subtracting 234 from 3010 gives us the final result of 2776.

    Rate this question:

  • 10. 

    145 - 267 + 188

    Explanation
    The given expression is 145 - 267 + 188. To solve this expression, we start from left to right. Subtracting 267 from 145 gives us -122. Then, adding 188 to -122 gives us a final result of 66.

    Rate this question:

  • 11. 

    4.67 + 71.3 - 19.231

    Explanation
    The given expression involves addition and subtraction of decimal numbers. Adding 4.67 and 71.3 gives 75.97. Subtracting 19.231 from 75.97 gives 56.739. Therefore, the correct answer is 56.739.

    Rate this question:

  • 12. 

    2.5 x 0.25

    Explanation
    The answer to 2.5 multiplied by 0.25 is 0.625.

    Rate this question:

  • 13. 

    5.2 - 3.43 + 1.123

    Explanation
    The given expression involves subtraction and addition of decimal numbers. When we subtract 3.43 from 5.2, we get 1.77. Adding 1.123 to 1.77 gives us 2.893. Therefore, the correct answer is 2.893.

    Rate this question:

  • 14. 

    2/3 + 3/5 (Improper fraction)

    Explanation
    The given expression is the sum of the improper fractions 2/3 and 3/5. To add these fractions, we need to find a common denominator, which in this case is 15. We then convert both fractions to have the same denominator: 2/3 becomes 10/15 and 3/5 becomes 9/15. Adding these fractions together gives us 19/15 as the final answer.

    Rate this question:

  • 15. 

    1/6 + 1/5

    Explanation
    The given expression is the sum of two fractions, 1/6 and 1/5. To find the sum, we need to find a common denominator. The least common multiple of 6 and 5 is 30. We can rewrite 1/6 as 5/30 and 1/5 as 6/30. Adding these fractions together gives us 11/30.

    Rate this question:

  • 16. 

    1/5 - 1/9

    Explanation
    The given expression represents the subtraction of two fractions. To subtract fractions, we need to have a common denominator. In this case, the common denominator is 45 (the least common multiple of 5 and 9). By converting 1/5 and 1/9 to have a denominator of 45, we get 9/45 and 5/45 respectively. Subtracting these fractions gives us 4/45. Therefore, the correct answer is 4/45.

    Rate this question:

  • 17. 

    16/27 x 18/28

    Explanation
    The given expression represents the multiplication of two fractions. To multiply fractions, we multiply the numerators together and the denominators together. In this case, multiplying 16/27 and 18/28 gives (16 x 18) / (27 x 28). Simplifying this further, we get 288 / 756, which can be reduced to its simplest form as 8/21.

    Rate this question:

  • 18. 

    36 x 25

    Explanation
    The given question is a multiplication problem, asking for the product of 36 and 25. The correct answer is 900, which is obtained by multiplying 36 by 25.

    Rate this question:

  • 19. 

    125 x 248

    Explanation
    The given calculation is the product of 125 and 248. When these two numbers are multiplied together, the result is 31000.

    Rate this question:

  • 20. 

    15 x 126

    Explanation
    The product of 15 multiplied by 126 is equal to 1890.

    Rate this question:

  • 21. 

    652 x 999

    Explanation
    The given multiplication problem is 652 multiplied by 999. The product of these two numbers is 651,348.

    Rate this question:

  • 22. 

    132 x 25

    Explanation
    The given multiplication problem is 132 multiplied by 25. When we multiply 132 by 25, we get the product of 3300.

    Rate this question:

  • 23. 

    864 x 125

    Explanation
    The calculation of 864 multiplied by 125 results in the answer of 108,000.

    Rate this question:

  • 24. 

    64 x 96

    Explanation
    The correct answer to the multiplication of 64 and 96 is 6144. This can be calculated by multiplying the tens digits of both numbers (6 x 9 = 54) and writing down the units digit of the result (4). Then, multiply the units digit of the first number with the second number (4 x 6 = 24) and add the carry from the previous step (2). Finally, multiply the units digits of both numbers (4 x 6 = 24) and write down the result. Combining these results gives us 6144.

    Rate this question:

  • 25. 

    117 x 113

    Explanation
    The given multiplication problem is asking for the product of 117 and 113. When these two numbers are multiplied together, the result is 13,221.

    Rate this question:

Quiz Review Timeline +

Our quizzes are rigorously reviewed, monitored and continuously updated by our expert board to maintain accuracy, relevance, and timeliness.

  • Current Version
  • Mar 22, 2023
    Quiz Edited by
    ProProfs Editorial Team
  • Feb 01, 2011
    Quiz Created by
    JETSPEED
Back to Top Back to top
Advertisement
×

Wait!
Here's an interesting quiz for you.

We have other quizzes matching your interest.