Practice Test Math Multiplication 2/1/08

10 Questions | Total Attempts: 284

SettingsSettingsSettings
Please wait...
Practice Math Quizzes & Trivia

This is a practice test on multiplication for Mrs. Currie's 6th grade class at Daybreak Middle School.


Questions and Answers
  • 1. 
    Multiplication: 544 x 432 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      236008

    • B. 

      237008

    • C. 

      235008

    • D. 

      235908

    • E. 

      234908

  • 2. 
    Multiplation: 33 x 55 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      1815

    • B. 

      1715

    • C. 

      1805

    • D. 

      1705

    • E. 

      1515

  • 3. 
    Multiplation: 102 x 155 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      25810

    • B. 

      15800

    • C. 

      15877

    • D. 

      15810

    • E. 

      15807

  • 4. 
    Multiplation: 10,000 x 273 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      273,000

    • B. 

      2,730,000

    • C. 

      27,300,000

    • D. 

      3,730,000

    • E. 

      373,000

  • 5. 
    Multiplation: 1777 x 135 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      238,985

    • B. 

      237,895

    • C. 

      237,995

    • D. 

      239,895

    • E. 

      240,985

  • 6. 
    Multiplation: 32 x 23 Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      636

    • B. 

      726

    • C. 

      736

    • D. 

      626

    • E. 

      756

  • 7. 
    Multiplation: 200 x 45 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      9000

    • B. 

      4500

    • C. 

      9500

    • D. 

      9200

    • E. 

      4900

  • 8. 
    Multiplation: 237 x 50 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      11150

    • B. 

      11850

    • C. 

      11150

    • D. 

      10850

    • E. 

      10150

  • 9. 
    Multiplation: 991 x 47 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      47977

    • B. 

      46977

    • C. 

      45577

    • D. 

      42577

    • E. 

      46577

  • 10. 
    Multiplation: 555 x 303 = Do work on a separate piece of paper. Do not use calculators.
    • A. 

      168,005

    • B. 

      168,165

    • C. 

      167,065

    • D. 

      158,155

    • E. 

      158,166